Description

This mock test of Simplification - MCQ 4 for Quant helps you for every Quant entrance exam.
This contains 20 Multiple Choice Questions for Quant Simplification - MCQ 4 (mcq) to study with solutions a complete question bank.
The solved questions answers in this Simplification - MCQ 4 quiz give you a good mix of easy questions and tough questions. Quant
students definitely take this Simplification - MCQ 4 exercise for a better result in the exam. You can find other Simplification - MCQ 4 extra questions,
long questions & short questions for Quant on EduRev as well by searching above.

QUESTION: 1

(√3 + 1)² = ? + √12

Solution:

(√3 + 1)² = ? + √12

3 + 2√3 + 1 = ? + 2√3 = 4

QUESTION: 2

621 ÷ 27 * 2 – 37 = √?

Solution:

621 ÷ 27 * 2 – 37 = √?

23 * 2 – 37 = √? = 9

x = 81

QUESTION: 3

**√? + 43 = √19881**

Solution:

√? + 43 = √19881

√? = 141 – 43

x = 9604

QUESTION: 4

325 – (12)² + 75 = (?)² – 68

Solution:

325 – (12)² + 75 = (?)² – 68

325 – 144 + 75 + 68 = (?)²

(?)² = 324

x = 18

QUESTION: 5

(62.5 * 14 * 5) ÷ 25 + 41 = (?)³

Solution:

(62.5 * 14 * 5) ÷ 25 + 41 = (?)³

4375 ÷ 25 + 41 = (?)³

(?)³ = 216

x = 6

QUESTION: 6

48356 + 5412 – 736 = ? * 40

Solution:

48356 + 5412 – 736 = x * 40

53032 = x * 40

x = 1325.8

QUESTION: 7

538.24 – 193.42 + 343.91 = ?

Solution:

538.24 – 193.42 + 343.91 = 882.15 – 193.42 = 688.73

QUESTION: 8

(32.4 * 8 * 5 + 4) ÷ 26 + 14 = (?)²

Solution:

32.4 * 8 * 5 + 4 = 1300

1300 ÷ 26 + 14 = 64 => x = 8

QUESTION: 9

3/8 of 4/5 of 5/6 of 7450 = ?

Solution:

3/8 of 4/5 of 5/6 of 7450 = 3/8 * 4/5 * 5/6 * 7450

= 7450/4 = 1862.5

QUESTION: 10

44616 ÷ √? = 143 * 6

Solution:

44616 ÷ √? = 143 * 6

√? = 2704

QUESTION: 11

45% of 300 + √? = 56% of 750 – 10% of 350

Solution:

45% of 300 + √x = 56% of 750 – 10% of 350

135 + √x = 420 – 35 ⇒ √x = 250

x = 62500

QUESTION: 12

[(?)^{11/7}/50] = [20/(?)^{10/7]}

Solution:

[(?)^{11/7}/50] = [20/(?)^{10/7}] x^{3} = 1000

x = 10

QUESTION: 13

79296 ÷ √x =112*12

Solution:

√x = 79296 / 112*12

√x = 59

x = 3481

QUESTION: 14

1637 + 1832 = (45)² + (?)²

Solution:

1637 + 1832 = (45)² + (?)²

(?)² = 3469 – 2025 = 1444 => x = 38

QUESTION: 15

13498 + 8932 – 1159 = ? * 89

Solution:

13498 + 8932 – 1159 = ? * 89

x * 89 = 21271 => x = 239

QUESTION: 16

(37685 + 29452 – 41897) ÷ 250 = ?

Solution:

(37685 + 29452 – 41897) ÷ 250

= 25240 ÷ 250 = 100.96

QUESTION: 17

75 / ? = ? / 147

Solution:

x² = 75 * 147 => x = 105

QUESTION: 18

(32.4 * 8 * 5 + 4) ÷ 26 + 14 = (?)²

Solution:

32.4 * 8 * 5 + 4 = 1300

1300 ÷ 26 + 14 = 64 => x = 8

QUESTION: 19

√(12 * 145 ÷ 6 + 34) = ?

Solution:

√(12 * 145 ÷ 6 + 34)

= √(290 + 34)

= 18

QUESTION: 20

5670 ÷ (28*13.5) = ?

Solution:

5670 ÷ (28*13.5)

= 5670 ÷ 378 = 15

### Simplification

Doc | 4 Pages

### Simplification Tricks (Part - 2)

Video | 32:41 min

### Simplification Tricks (Part - 1)

Video | 10:11 min

- Simplification - MCQ 4
Test | 20 questions | 15 min

- Simplification - MCQ 5
Test | 20 questions | 15 min

- Simplification MCQ 2
Test | 20 questions | 30 min

- Simplification - MCQ 3
Test | 20 questions | 15 min

- Simplification - MCQ 1
Test | 20 questions | 40 min