1 Crore+ students have signed up on EduRev. Have you? 
2 × 4 = 8, 5 × 2 = 10, 9 × 3 = 27 Similarly, 5 × 6 = 30.
55555 × 5 = 277775
Direction: Based on the following table answer the following questions.
Q. How many children does each represent?
Hyderabad = 4200 = 7 × 600 Mumbai = 3000 =5 × 600 So, each represents 600 children.
Direction: Based on the following table answer the following questions.
Q. Which of the following is the correct representation of the number of children in Delhi?
Delhi = 2700 = 4 × 600 + 300 So number of children in Delhi can be represented as
(200 + 5) × 6 = 200 × 6 + 5 × 6
Direction: Based on the following figures and the given table shows which the number of squares formed by the number of dots.
? and so on.
Q. How many dots are required to form 25 squares?
If the number of squares is 1 = 1 × 1 the number of dots required = 2 × 2 = 4. If the number of squares is 4 = 2 × 2 the number of dots required = 3 × 3 = 9. If the number of squares is 9 = 3 × 3 The number of dots required = 4 × 4 = 16 If the number of squares is 16 the number of dots required = 5 × 5 = 25. So, to form 25 squares =5 × 5, the number of dots required = 6 × 6 = 36.
Direction: Based on the following figures and the given table shows which the number of squares formed by the number of dots.
? and so on.
Q. How many squares are formed by 49 dots?
Number of squares formed by 49 dots = 6 × 6 = 36
Observe the following multiplications and find the product 707×707.
Observation is, 404 × 404 = 163216 = (4 × 4) (16 + 16) (4 × 4) 505 × 505 = 255025 = (5 × 5) (25 + 25) (5 × 5) 606 × 606 = 367236 = (6 × 6) (36 + 36) (6 × 6) So, 707 × 707 =(7 × 7)(49 + 49)(7 × 7) = 499849
Identify the product 15 × 31 × 78 estimated by rounding each number to the nearest ten.
What is the product of the place values of "5" as shown on the spike abacus?
How many minutes were there in the month of February, 2004?
Pandu and Raghu wrote two 2digit numbers, each having the digit 7 only once and in the place shown.
Pandu
& Raghu
If Pandu wrote the greatest two digit number and Raghu wrote the least two digit number, what is their product?
The greatest two digit number written by Pandu is 97. The least two digit number written by Raghu is 70. Their product = 97 × 70 = 6790
Find the product of the numbers shown on the spike abacuses.
497 × 54 = 26838
A factory manufactures 1617 shoes in a week. How many shoes does it manufacture in a day?
1 week = 7 days
∴ No. of shoes manufactured in a day = 231
The product of two numbers is 476. If one number is 34, what is the other number?
The other number = 476 ÷ 34 = 14
If 5 transistors cost Rs. 1525, find the cost of each transistor.
The cost of each transistor = 1525 ÷ 15 = 305
Madhu divided 3250 by 18 and obtained a quotient of 179 and remainder of 28.Forthisproblem, which of these checks will help Madhu to find out his mistakes?
He has to check if Dividend = Quotient × Divisor + Remainder.
Study the given number sentences.
If these number sentences are true, which of the following may be correct?
If = 3 and = 9
The exact value of a dollar compared to the Indian rupee changes from day to day. On a given day, Rs. 288 was worth 6 dollars. How many dollars would Rs. 480 have been worth on that day?
The value of 1 dollar = 288 ÷ 6 = Rs. 48
∴ The required number of dollars = 480 ÷ 48 = 10
Murali arranged some marbles as shown.
Which of the following division facts is best represented by grouping of marbles?
(All the marbles must be considered)
The arrangement of marbles clearly indicates 21 ÷ 5 gives quotient 4 and remainder 1.
24 videos44 docs32 tests

Use Code STAYHOME200 and get INR 200 additional OFF

Use Coupon Code 
24 videos44 docs32 tests








