1 Crore+ students have signed up on EduRev. Have you? 
In the examination a candidate must get 2/5 marks to pass, out of total marks.Shiyam appeared in the exam ang got 198 marks and still failed by 36 marks.The maximum mark is
2x = 198+36 = 234
Max = 234*5/2 = 585
If 4 is added to the numerator of a fraction it becomes 1/3 and if 3 is added to the denominator it becomes 1/6 then find the numerator and denominator is
5/27 = 9/27 = 1/3
5/30 = 1/6
Onethird of a 2 digit number exceeds its onefifth by 8.What is the 2 digit number ?
1/3(10x+y) 1/5(10x+y) = 8
(10x+y)[5/15 – 3/15] = 8
10x+y = 8*15/2 = 60
Sum of square number = n(n+1)(2n+1)/6
N = 24
Sum = 24*25*49/6 = 4900
Micael gets 3 marks for each correct questions and loses 2 marks for each wrong answers.He attempts 30 sum and obtain 30 marks.Find the no of Questions he answered correctly ?
18*3 – 12*2 = 5424 = 30
What half of a number is added to 234, it becomes five time of itself. What is the number ?
x/2 + 234 = 5x
5x – x/2 = 234
9x/2 = 234
X = 234*2/9= 52
Twenty times a positive integer is less than its square by 96. What is the Integer ?
X^{2} – 20x = 96
(x24)(x+4) = 0
X = 24
There are some Parrots and Some Lions in a forest.If the total number of animals head in forest are 840 and total no of animal legs are 1760.What is the number of Parots in the forest ?
2x+4(840x) = 1760
2x+33604x = 1760
2x = 1600
X = 1600/2 = 800
When all the students in a school are made to stand in row of 68, 40 such rows are formed.If the students are made to stand in the row of 20, how many such rows can be formed ?
No of row = 68*40/20 = 136
A banana costs Rs.1.25 and Orange costs Rs2.75. What will be the total cost of 10 bananas and 2 dozens Orange ?
1.25*10 +2.75*24 = 12.5 +66 = 78.50
1*2*3*………………………………26*27
Factorial after 6 should end with 0
x^{p} × x^{q} × x^{r} = 1 then p^{3} + q^{3} + r^{3} is equal to
If the divisor is five times the quotient and six times the remainder, if the remainder is 5 then the dividend is
Q=6, R = 5
Dividend = divisor*Q + R
Dividend = 30*6 + 5 = 180+5 = 185
If the sum and the product of 2 numbers are 25 and 144 respectively then the difference of the number should be
A+B = 25
AB = 24
(ab)^{2} = (a+b)^{2} – 4ab
(ab)^{2} = 25 – 4(144)
(ab)^{2} = 625 – 576
(ab)^{2} = 49
ab = 7
The sum of the two digit number is 11. The number obtained by reversing the digit is 27 less than the original number.Then the original number is
4+7 = 11
7447 = 27
The product of 2 consecutive even number is 1224, then one of the number is
34*36 = 1224
1^{2} +2^{2} +3^{2} +…………………n^{2} = 1/6[n(n+1)(2n+1)]
= 30*31*61/6 – 20*21*41/6
= 9455 – 2870 = 6585
A number when divided by 361 gives a remainder 47. If the Same number is divided by 19 ,the remainder is
47÷19 ⇒ remainder 9
Ex : 769 ÷ 361 ⇒ remainder 47
769 ÷ 19 ⇒ remainder 9
The respective ratio between the two digit of a number is 5:3, if the digit at the one’s place is twice the digit at ten’s place.What is the number ?
2x/x = 5/3
6x = 5x
N is the smallest number which when added to the 2000 makes the resulting number divisible by 12, 16, 18 and 21, Then the N is
LCM of 12, 16, 18, 21 = 1008
1008*2 = 2016
N = 16
56 videos35 docs91 tests

Use Code STAYHOME200 and get INR 200 additional OFF

Use Coupon Code 
56 videos35 docs91 tests








