Worksheet Solutions: Multiplication

# Multiplication Class 6 Worksheet Maths

### Q1: Find the following products

(i) 38 x 9
Ans: 38 x 9 = 342
(ii) 80 x 5
Ans: 80 x 5 = 400

(iii) 53 x 8
Ans: 53 x 8 = 424

### Q2: Multiply

(i) 4,032 by 198
Ans:
=  4,032 x 198 = 798336

(ii) 3,647 by 245
Ans:
3,647 x  245 = 893515

(iii) 501 by 123
Ans:
= 501 x 123 = 61623

### Q3: Fill in the blanks

(i) 2,586 x ______ = 2,586
Ans: 2,586 x = 2,586
(Identity Property: The product of any number with 1 is as same as the number itself.)

(ii) 624 x ______ = 38 x 624
Ans: 624 x 38 = 38 x 624
(Commutative property of multiplication is a math rule that says you can multiply numbers in any order, and the result will be the same.)

(iii) 600 x ______ = 0.
Ans: 600 x 0 = 0
(Zero property of multiplication is a fundamental rule in mathematics that states that any number multiplied by zero is equal to zero.)

### Q4: Round off the following numbers to the nearest tens

(i) 13,528
Ans: Here's the general rule for rounding:

• Number >= 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 5, 6, 7, 8, or 9, round the number up. Example: 38 rounded to the nearest ten is 40.
• Number < 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 0, 1, 2, 3, or 4, round the number down. Example: 33 rounded to the nearest ten is 30.

Therefore, applying these rules, we get:
13,528 = 13,530

(ii) 3,542
Ans: Here's the general rule for rounding:

• Number >= 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 5, 6, 7, 8, or 9, round the number up. Example: 38 rounded to the nearest ten is 40.
• Number < 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 0, 1, 2, 3, or 4, round the number down. Example: 33 rounded to the nearest ten is 30.

Therefore, applying these rules, we get:
3,542 = 3,540

(iii) 174
Ans: Here's the general rule for rounding:

• Number >= 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 5, 6, 7, 8, or 9, round the number up. Example: 38 rounded to the nearest ten is 40.
• Number < 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 0, 1, 2, 3, or 4, round the number down. Example: 33 rounded to the nearest ten is 30.

Therefore, applying these rules, we get:
174 = 170

### Q5: Estimate each of the following products by rounding off each number to the nearest tens

(i) 52 x 43
Ans: Here's the general rule for rounding:

• Number >= 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 5, 6, 7, 8, or 9, round the number up. Example: 38 rounded to the nearest ten is 40.
• Number < 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 0, 1, 2, 3, or 4, round the number down. Example: 33 rounded to the nearest ten is 30.

Therefore, applying these rules, we get:
52 x 43 = 50 x 40 = 2000

(ii) 63 x 52
Ans: Here's the general rule for rounding:

• Number >= 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 5, 6, 7, 8, or 9, round the number up. Example: 38 rounded to the nearest ten is 40.
• Number < 5: If the number you are rounding is followed by 0, 1, 2, 3, or 4, round the number down. Example: 33 rounded to the nearest ten is 30.

Therefore, applying these rules, we get:
63 x 52 = 60 x 50 = 3000

### Q6: Find the following products mentally

(i) 995 x 995 ______.
Ans: 990,995

(ii) 705 x 705  ______.
Ans: 497,025

(iii) 499 x 491 ______.
Ans: 245,009

### Q7: Answer the following Questions

(i) Find the product of the place-values of 6 in 6,965 ______.

Ans: The place value of 1st 6 in 6,965 is at thousand's place.
=> First place value of 6 = 6000
The place value of 2nd 6 in 6,965 is at ten's place.
=> Second place value of 6 = 6000
Product of the place values of 6 in the number 6,965 = 6000 x 60 = 360000

(ii) Find the product of the greatest 2-digit number and the smallest 4-digit number ______.
Ans: Greatest 2-digit no. = 99
Smallest 4-digit no. = 1000
Therefore, the product of the greatest 2-digit number and the smallest 4-digit number = 1000 x 99 = 99000.

(iii) A transistor costs Rs. 1,642. Find the cost of 95 such transistors.

Ans: Cost of one Transistor = Rs 1,642
Total number of transistors = 95
Cost of 95 Transistors = 1642 x 95 = 155,990

(iv) A candle factory produced 814 candles in a day. How many candles will this factory produce in a year?

Ans: A candle factory produces candles in a day =  814
Total  number of days in a leap year = 365
Candles this factory will produce in one year = 814 x 365 = 2,97,110

(v) A farmer produced 735 quintals of rice. He sold it at the rate of Rs 1525 per quintal. How much money did he get?
Ans: A farmer produced rice = 735 quintals
Cost per quintal = Rs. 1525
Money he got = 1525 x 735 = Rs. 1,120,875

(vi) The cost of a pack of Ghee is Rs. 308 Find the cost of 97 such packs.
Ans: The cost of 1 pack of Ghee = Rs. 308
Total number of packs = 97
Therefore, Total Cost of 97 packs of Ghee = 308 x 97 = 29,876

The document Multiplication Class 6 Worksheet Maths is a part of the Class 1 Course Mental Maths.
All you need of Class 1 at this link: Class 1

## Mental Maths

30 videos|64 docs|19 tests

## FAQs on Multiplication Class 6 Worksheet Maths

 1. How do you multiply two-digit numbers using the column method?
Ans. To multiply two-digit numbers using the column method, you first write the numbers one below the other, with the units digit of the bottom number aligned with the units digit of the top number. Then, you multiply the units digit of the bottom number by each digit of the top number, starting from the right, and write the results in a column. Finally, you add up the results to get the final product.
 2. Can you explain the concept of carrying over while multiplying two-digit numbers?
Ans. Carrying over in multiplication occurs when the product of two digits is greater than 9. In such cases, the digit in the tens place is carried over to the next column. For example, when multiplying 26 by 3, the product of 6 and 3 is 18. Since 18 is greater than 9, we write down the 8 in the units place and carry over the 1 to the tens place.
 3. How can the distributive property be applied to multiplication of two-digit numbers?
Ans. The distributive property states that for any three numbers a, b, and c, a x (b + c) = (a x b) + (a x c). When multiplying two-digit numbers, you can apply this property by breaking down one of the numbers into its place value components and multiplying each component separately before adding the results together to get the final product.
 4. What are some strategies to help children memorize multiplication tables?
Ans. Some strategies to help children memorize multiplication tables include using flashcards, playing multiplication games, practicing with multiplication worksheets, using mnemonic devices, and incorporating multiplication into daily activities like cooking or shopping.
 5. How can parents support their children in learning multiplication at home?
Ans. Parents can support their children in learning multiplication at home by creating a positive learning environment, providing resources such as multiplication charts or apps, practicing multiplication together, offering encouragement and praise, and seeking help from teachers or tutors if needed.

## Mental Maths

30 videos|64 docs|19 tests

### Up next

 Explore Courses for Class 1 exam

### Top Courses for Class 1

Signup to see your scores go up within 7 days! Learn & Practice with 1000+ FREE Notes, Videos & Tests.
10M+ students study on EduRev
Related Searches

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

,

;