Description

This mock test of Unit Digit Calculation - Practice Test for UPSC helps you for every UPSC entrance exam.
This contains 5 Multiple Choice Questions for UPSC Unit Digit Calculation - Practice Test (mcq) to study with solutions a complete question bank.
The solved questions answers in this Unit Digit Calculation - Practice Test quiz give you a good mix of easy questions and tough questions. UPSC
students definitely take this Unit Digit Calculation - Practice Test exercise for a better result in the exam. You can find other Unit Digit Calculation - Practice Test extra questions,
long questions & short questions for UPSC on EduRev as well by searching above.

QUESTION: 1

What is the unit digit in the product (3^{65} x 6^{59} x 7^{71}) ?

Solution:

Explanation:

Unit digit in 3^{4} = 1 Unit digit in (3^{4})^{16} = 1

Unit digit in 3^{65} = Unit digit in [ (3^{4})^{16} x 3 ] = (1 x 3) = 3

Unit digit in 6^{59} = 6

Unit digit in 7^{4} Unit digit in (7^{4})^{17} is 1.

Unit digit in 7^{71} = Unit digit in [(7^{4})^{17} x 7^{3}] = (1 x 3) = 3

Required digit = Unit digit in (3 x 6 x 3) = 4.

QUESTION: 2

What is the unit digit in 7^{105} ?

Solution:

Explanation:

Unit digit in 7^{105} = Unit digit in [ (7^{4})^{26} x 7 ]

But, unit digit in (7^{4})^{26} = 1

Unit digit in 7^{105} = (1 x 7) = 7

QUESTION: 3

The unit digit in the product (784 x 618 x 917 x 463) is:

Solution:

Unit digit in the given product = Unit digit in (4 x 8 x 7 x 3) = (672) = 2

QUESTION: 4

The unit digit of the sum 1289 + 2541 + 8215 + 6137 is:

Solution:

Solution: The required answer is the unit digit of the sum of the unit digits of the numbers in given sum. i.e., The unit digit of (1289 + 2541 + 8215 + 6137) = the unit digit of (9+1+5+7) = the unit digit of (22) = 2 Hence the answer is 2.

QUESTION: 5

The unit digit of the product 1022 x 729 x 889 x 971 is:

Solution:

a)2

Solution:

The required answer is the unit digit of the product of the unit digits of the numbers in given product.

i.e, The unit digit of (1022 x 729 x 889 x 971)

= the unit digit of (2 x 9 x 9 x 1)

= the unit digit of (162)

= 2

Hence, the answer is 2.

### Number System (Unit Digit)

Video | 23:43 min

### Practice Test - Unit, Motion in 1D, 2D & 3D

Doc | 4 Pages

### The Concept of Unit Digit (Part-1)

Video | 20:55 min

- Unit Digit Calculation - Practice Test
Test | 5 questions | 10 min

- Test: Unit Digit- 1
Test | 15 questions | 20 min

- Test: Unit Digit- 2
Test | 10 questions | 20 min

- Finding Unit Digit - MCQ Test
Test | 5 questions | 10 min

- Unit & Dimension Practice Level - 1
Test | 30 questions | 60 min