The document Worksheet Questions (Part - 1) - Whole Numbers Class 6 Notes | EduRev is a part of the Class 6 Course Mathematics (Maths) Class 6.

All you need of Class 6 at this link: Class 6

**Ques 1: Fill in the blanks****(a) ____ x 13 = 13 x 18****Ans: **18

**(b) Whole numbers are closed under _______ and ________ operation.****Ans: **Addition and Multiplication.

**(c) Division by ______ is not defined.****Ans:** Zero

**(d) _______ is the identity for multiplication.****Ans: **1

**(e) If ______ is added to a number, the sum will remain the same. Hence ______is called the __________ in the whole numbers.****Ans: **0, 0,Identity element for Addition.**Ques 2: Seema got 99 marks in Math, 69 marks in English, and 91 in Science. Another student Rita got 92 marks in Math, 33 in English and 84 in Science. What are their total marks?****Ans: **Marks obtained by Seema:

Math = 99

English = 69

Science = 91

∴ Total marks obtained by Seema = 99 + 69 + 91 = 259

Marks obtained by Rita:

Math = 92

English = 33

Science = 84

So Total marks obtained by Rita = 92 + 33 + 84 = 209**Ques 3: Ramesh ordered 10 cartons of chocolates to distribute among the class. Each carton holds 20 boxes and each box has 12 chocolates. How many chocolates did Ramesh order altogether?****Ans: **2400 chocolates**Ques 4: Mukesh lives form a hostel which charges Rs 55 for Dinner and 45 for Lunch. Find the money he has to pay for seven days.****Ans: **Amount paid for lunch = 45

Amount paid for dinner = 55

Number of days = 7

Money paid by him in 7 days = 7 x (55 +45) = 700**Ques 5: Find the sum by suitable rearrangement:****(a)** **837 + 208 + 363 ****(b)** **1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647****Ans: **(A) 837 + 208 + 363 = (837 + 363) + 208

= 1200 + 208 = 1408

(b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647 = (1962 + 1538) + (453 + 647)

= 3500 + 1100 = 4600**Ques 6: Find the product by suitable rearrangement:****(a)**** 2 x 1768 x 50(b) 4 x 166 x 25(c) 8 x 291 x 125(d) 625 x 279 x 16(e) 285 x 5 x 60(f) 125 x 40 x 8 x 25**

= 100 x 1768 = 176800

(b)

= 100 x 166 = 16600

(c) 8 x 291 x 125 = 8 x 125 x 291

= 1000 x 291 = 291000

(d)

= 10000 x 279 = 2790000

(e) 285 x 5 x 60 = 285 x 300 = 85500

(f) 125 x 40 x 8 x 25 = 125 x 8 x 40 x 25

= 1000 x 1000 = 1000000

Quantity of petrol filled on Tuesday = 50

Total quantity filled = (40 + 50)

Cost of petrol (per

Total money spent = 44 × (40 + 50)

= 44 × 90 = Rs 3960

Quantity of milk supplied in the evening = 68

Total of milk per litre = (32 + 68)

Cost of milk per litre = Rs 15

Total cost per day = 15 * (32 + 68)

= 15 * 100 = Rs 1500

For example, 0 * 2 = 0 and 17 * 0 = 0

If the product of 2 whole numbers is zero, then both of them may be zero.

0 * 0 = 0

However, 2 * 3 = 6

(Since numbers to be multiplied are not equal to zero, the result of the product will also be non-zero.)

For example, 1 * 1 = 1

However, 1 * 6 = 6

Clearly, the product of two whole numbers will be 1 in the situation when both numbers to

be multiplied are 1.

(33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52)

As 530 > 503,

503 is on the left side of 530 on the number line.

(b)

As 370 > 307,

307 is on the left side of 370 on the number line.

(c) 98765, 56789

As 98765 > 56789,

56789 is on the left side of 98765 on the number line.

(d) 9830415, 10023001

Since 98, 30, 415 < 1, 00, 23, 001,

98,30,415 is on the left side of 1,00,23,001 on the number line.

**(b) 405 + 405 x 29****Ans. **= 405 (1 + 29) = 405 (30) = 12150

**(c) 3845 x 5 x 782 + 769 x 25 x 218****Ans:** = (769 x 5) x 5 x 782 + 769 x 25 x 218

= 769 x 25 x 782 + 769 x 25 x 218

= 769 x 25 (782 + 218) = 19225 (1000) = 19225000**Ques 14: Write 5 successive numbers just after 4023.****Ans: **4024, 4025, 4026, 4027, 4028**Ques 15: Write the smallest and largest 6 digit whole number.****Ans:** Smallest - 100000

Largest - 999999

Offer running on EduRev: __Apply code STAYHOME200__ to get INR 200 off on our premium plan EduRev Infinity!

185 videos|229 docs|43 tests