Q 1:
(a) The number name of 45,678 in the Indian system of numeration is ________.
Ans: Fortyfive thousand, six hundred seventyeight.
(b) Place value of 4 in ‘56743’ is ________.
Ans: Tens
(c) Expanded form of 6549 is ________.
Ans: 6 x 1000 + 5 x 100 + 4 x 10 + 9 x 1
= 6000 + 500 +40 + 9
(d) The number name of 756432 in the international system of numeration is ________.
Ans: Seven hundred fifty six thousand, four hundred thirty two.
Q 2: In the Indian System of Numeration, the number 61711682 is written, using commas, as __________.
Ans: The Indian numbering system groups the rightmost three digits together (until the hundreds place), and thereafter groups by sets of two digits.
Writing numbers in Indian system,
The first comma comes before 682 as until hundred places then after before 11 and before 17.
61711682=6,17,11,682
Therefore, Indian system of numeration the number 617 11682 is written using commas as 6,17,11,682.
Q 3: The smallest 4digit number with different digits is __________ .
Ans: 1023
The smallest digit, other than 0, at the thousand place to make the smallest 4 digit number is 1. As 1 is already used, the smallest digit (0) can be used at hundred place.
Similarly, we can place 2 at the tenth position and 3 at the unit position.
So, the smallest 4digit number is 1023.
Q 4: 3×10000+0×1000+8×100+0×10+7×13+1000×0+100 is same as
(a) 3091
(b) 30991
(c) 30091
(d) 391
Ans. The correct answer is (B) 30991
Q 5: 1 billion is equal to
(a) 100 million
(b) 10 millions
(c) 1000 lakhs
(d) 10000 lakhs
Ans. The correct answer is (D) 10000 lakhs.
Q 6: Which of the following numbers in Roman Numerals is incorrect?
(a) LXII
(b) XCI
(c) LC
(d) XLIV
Ans. The correct answer is (C) LC.
Q 7: A box contains 5,00,000 medicine tablets, each weighing 50 mg. What is the total weight of all the tablets in the box in grams and in kilograms?
Ans:
Weight of each tablet = 50 mg
Weight of box containing 5,00,000 tablets = 5,00,000 × 50 mg.
= 2,50,00,000 mg
= 2,50,00,000 mg/1000 = 25000 g
= 25000 g/1000 = 25 kg
Q 8: The population of Shivaji park was 2,35,471 in the year 2002. In the year 2012, it was found to be increased by 72,958. What was the population of the city in 2012?
Ans:
Population of Shivaji park in the year 2002 = 2,35,471
Increase in the population in the year 2012 = 72,958
Total population of the city in the year 2012 = 2,35,471 + 72,958 = 3,08,429
Q 9: The town newspaper is published every day. One copy has 12 pages. Every day 12,000 copies are printed. How many total pages are printed every day?
Ans:
Number of pages in each copy = 12
Number of pages in 12,000 copies = 12,000 × 12 = 1,44,000
Therefore, number of pages printed every day = 1,44,000
Q 10: Starting from the greatest 5digit number, write the previous five numbers in descending order.
Ans:
The largest 5digit number is 99999.
The previous five numbers starting with 99999 in descending order are:
99999, 99998, 99997, 99996, 99995
Q 11: Write 527864 using commas in Indian as well as International System of Numeration.
Ans:
The given number is 527864
Indian system of numeration = 5,27,864
International system of numeration = 527,864
Q 12: In Mumbai, the number of bicycles sold in the year 20112012 was 7,43,000. In the year 20122013, the number of bicycles sold was 8,00,100. In which year, more bicycles were sold and by how many?
Ans:
The number of bicycles sold in the year 20112012 = 7,43,000
The number of bicycles sold in the year 20122013 = 8,00,100
We observe that 8,00,100 > 7,43,000
That is, in the year 20122013, more bicycles were sold by (8,00,100 – 7,43,000) = 57,100
Q 13: Starting from the smallest 8digit number, write the next five numbers in ascending order.
Ans:
The smallest 8digit number is 1,00,00,000.
The next five numbers in the ascending order are 10000000, 10000001, 10000002, 10000003, 10000004
Q 14: Write 8945673 using commas in Indian as well as International System of Numeration.
Ans:
The given number is 8945673
Indian system of numeration = 89,45,673
International system of numeration = 8,945,673
Q 15: The number of sheets of paper available for making notebooks is 25,000. Each sheet makes 12 pages of a notebook. Each notebook contains 300 pages. How many notebooks can be made from the paper available?
Ans:
Number of sheets of paper available = 2,5000
Number of pages can be made with 1 sheet of paper = 12
Number of pages can be made with 2,5000 sheets of paper = 2,5000 × 12 = 3,00,000
Number of pages in each notebook = 300
Number of notebooks that can be prepared with the paper available = 3,00,000/300
= 1000 notebooks
Q 16: Sunny is a famous cricket player. He has so far scored 7,280 runs in test matches. He wishes to complete 10,000 runs. How many more runs does he need?
Ans:
Number of runs scored so far = 7,280
Number of runs he wishes to score = 10,000
Number of runs he need to score = 10,000 – 7,280 = 2,720
Q 17: In an election, the successful candidate registered 6,72,500 votes and his nearest rival secured 4,78,500 votes. By what margin did the successful candidate win the election?
Ans:
Number of votes registered by the successful candidate = 6,72,500
Number of votes registered by the rival (opponent) = 4,78,500
successful candidate won the election by a margin of
6,72,500 – 4,78,500 = 1,94,000 votes
Q 18: The distance between the school and the house of a student is 1 km 875 m. Every day she walks both ways. Find the total distance covered by her in 15 days.
Ans:
Distance between the school and the house = 1 km 875 m
= 1000 m + 875 m
= 1,875 m.
Distance travelled by the student both ways, every day = 1,875 m × 2 = 3,750 m
Distance travelled by the student in 15 days = 3,750 m × 15
= 56,250 m
= 56 km 250 m
Q 19: Medicine is packed in boxes, each weighing 5 kg 200 g. How many such boxes can be loaded in a van which cannot carry beyond 260 kg?
Ans:
Weight of each box = 5 kg 200 g = 5 × 1000 g + 200 g
= 5000 g + 200 g = 5200 g
Maximum weight that can be loaded in a van = 260 kg = 260 × 1000 g = 260000 g
No. of boxes that can be loaded in the van = 260000/5200 = 50 boxes
Q 20: A student multiplied 1234 by 32 instead of multiplying by 23. By how much was his answer greater than the correct answer?
Ans:
The student did the problem as 1234 × 32 (incorrect), instead of 1234 × 23 (correct) Difference in the answers :
(1234 × 32) – (1234 × 23)
= 1234 × (32 – 23)
= 1234 × 9
= 11,106
113 videos293 docs36 tests

1. What is the article "Knowing Our Numbers 1 Class 6" about? 
2. What topics are covered in the "Knowing Our Numbers 1 Class 6" exam? 
3. What are some important tips to prepare for the "Knowing Our Numbers 1 Class 6" exam? 
4. How to improve mathematical skills for "Knowing Our Numbers 1 Class 6" exam? 
5. How to manage time during the "Knowing Our Numbers 1 Class 6" exam? 
113 videos293 docs36 tests


Explore Courses for Class 6 exam
